EP1593958 - Disposable Test Strips with integrated reagent/blood seperation layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diabetes Diagnostics, Inc. 51 Sawyer Road, Suite 150 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2010/08] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Diabetes Diagnostics, Inc. 51 Sawyer Road, Suite 150 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mcaleer, Jerome F. 52 Nobles Close Wantage Oxon, OX12 ONR / GB | 02 /
Scott, David 68 Newland Mill Witney Oxon, OX8 6S2 / GB | 03 /
Plotkin, Elliott V. 25 Broadstone Park Inverness IV2 3JZ / GB | 04 /
Hall, Geoff Carsewood Fortrose Ross-shire, IV10 8SH / GB | 05 /
Alvarez-Icaza, Manuel 3 Reay Street Inverness IV3 3AJ / GB | [2010/08] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
Mcaleer, Jerome F. 52 Nobles Close Wantage Oxon, OX12 ONR / GB | ||
02 /
Scott, David 68 Newland Mill Witney Oxon, OX8 6S2 / GB | |||
03 /
Plotkin, Elliot V. 25 Broadstone Park Inverness IV2 3JZ / GB | |||
04 /
Hall, Geoff Carsewood Fortrose Ross-shire, IV10 8SH / GB | |||
05 /
Alvarez-Icaza, Manuel 3 Reay Street Inverness IV3 3AJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
Mcaleer, Jerome F. 52 Nobles Close Wantage Oxon, OX12 ONR / GB | ||
02 /
Scott, David 68 Newland Mill Witney Oxon, OX8 6S2 / GB | |||
03 /
Plotkin, Elliot V. 25 Broadstone Park Inverness IV2 3JZ / GB | |||
04 /
Hall, Geoff Bridge House Resaurie Inverness IV1 2NH / GB | |||
05 /
Alvarez-Icaza, Manuel 3 Reay Street Inverness IV3 3AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Samuels, Adrian James Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05015727.0 | 11.01.2000 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | US19990228855 | 12.01.1999 Original published format: US 228855 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593958 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1593958 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593958 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/30, C12Q1/00 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP,US);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/54 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N33/5002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/45] | Title | German: | Wegwerfteststreifen mit einer intergrierten Reagenz/Blut Trennschicht | [2005/45] | English: | Disposable Test Strips with integrated reagent/blood seperation layer | [2005/45] | French: | Bandelettes de test jetables à couche de séparation réactif/sang integrée | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00906895.8 / EP1155310 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | [2011/07] |
Former [2010/51] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PT | 25.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0289269 (MEDISENSE INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 30 - column 3, line 62 *; | [A]US5628890 (CARTER NIGEL F [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 40 - column 6, line 65; example 1 *; | [A]US5658444 (BLACK MURDO [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 18 - column 6, line 17 *; | [X]US5708247 (MCALEER JEROME F [GB], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * * in particular Figures 1A, 1B, 7, and passages in the specification referring to said figures; col. 2, line 39 - col. 3, line 3 col. 4, lines 4-19; col. 4, lines 35-38; col. 4, line 58 - col. 5, line 2 *; | [A]US5762770 (PRITCHARD G JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 25 *; | [PX]US5951836 (MCALEER JEROME F [GB], et al) [PX] 1-17* column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 30 * | by applicant | EP0127958 | US5141868 | US5286362 | US5288636 | US5437999 | US5658444 |