EP1627693 - Device for cleaning and/or disinfecting elongated hollow bodies, in particular medical tubes and catheters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BHT Hygienetechnik GmbH Messerschmittstrasse 11 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Annecke, Karl Heinz, Dr. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 29 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | von Bülow, Tam Rotbuchenstrasse 6 81547 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | von Bülow, Tam Patentanwaltskanzlei Rotbuchenstrasse 6 81547 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | von Bülow, Tam Mailänder Strasse 13 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015825.2 | 21.07.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | DE20041040734 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004040734 | [2006/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627693 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1627693 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627693 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/02, A61B19/00, A61L2/18, A61L2/26 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B08B9/0323 (EP);
A61B1/123 (EP);
A61B1/125 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP);
A61L2/18 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen und/oder Desinfizieren von langgestreckten Hohlkörpern, insbesondere von medizinischen Schläuchen und Kathetern | [2006/08] | English: | Device for cleaning and/or disinfecting elongated hollow bodies, in particular medical tubes and catheters | [2006/08] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage et/ou de désinfection des corps creux, en particulier des tubes médicaux et des cathéters | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/08] | Dispositif de nettoyage et/ou de désinfection de corps creux, en particulier de tubes médicaux et de cathéters | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2005 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | LU | 21.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3875955 (GALLATIN ROBERT A, et al) [A] 2-4 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 6 *; | [A]DE2751743 (PIERBURG LUFTFAHRTGERAETE) [A] 2-4 * page 5, paragraph L *; | [A]EP0075657 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE3720347 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4217577 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 2-4 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]EP0709056 (FUJINON MEDICAL HOLLAND B V [NL]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 4-44 * * column 4, lines 35-48 * * column 5, lines 25-41 * * figures 3,4 *; | [DA]DE10321991 (BHT HYGIENE TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-3 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * claims 1,9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2004049924 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al)[A] 1,6,7; | [PA]EP1502538 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0180] - [0182] * * paragraphs [0196] - [0199] * * figures 15,17,18 * |