EP1623794 - Device for peening workpiece surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayer, Erwin, Dr. Ostenstrasse 36 85221 Dachau / DE | 02 /
Dautl, Thomas Schäfflerstrasse 23 85258 Weichs / DE | 03 /
Peschke, Thomas Herbststrasse 9a 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | 04 /
Polanetzki, Holger Münchner Strasse 38 85221 Dachau / DE | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 05016117.3 | 25.07.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | DE20041037954 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004037954 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623794 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623794 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/10, B24C5/08 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B24C5/005 (EP,US);
B24C1/10 (EP,US);
B24C5/08 (EP,US);
Y10S451/91 (EP,US);
Y10S72/71 (EP,US);
Y10T29/479 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/41] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Oberflächenstrahlen von Bauteilen | [2006/06] | English: | Device for peening workpiece surfaces | [2006/06] | French: | Dispositif pour le grenaillage de précontrainte de surfaces des pièces | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4991360 (DESPAIN JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9,12,14 * figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [X]US2002042978 (CHEPPE PATRICK [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0145] - [0154] * * figure 10 * * abstract *; | [DA]US6536109 (BERTHELET BENOIT JEAN HENRI [FR], et al) [DA] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US6526109 | US6536109 |