EP1747997 - Apparatus and method for filling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/05] | apparatus and method for filling | ||
[2008/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDAG Gesellschaft für Industriebedarf mbH & Co. Betriebs KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107 - 115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016444.1 | 28.07.2005 | [2007/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747997 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747997 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02, B65B55/06, A23C3/027, A23L2/46, B65B3/04 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A23L2/46 (EP,US);
B65B3/04 (KR);
A23C3/027 (EP,US);
B65B3/00 (KR);
B65B3/045 (EP,US);
B65B3/16 (KR);
B65B51/00 (KR);
B65B55/022 (EP,US);
B65B55/06 (EP,US);
B67C3/045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | 24.01.2007 | BA | 24.01.2007 | HR | 24.01.2007 | MK | 24.01.2007 | YU | 24.01.2007 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abfüllen | [2007/05] | English: | Apparatus and method for filling | [2008/38] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de remplissage | [2007/05] |
Former [2007/05] | apparatus and method for filling | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08006000.7 / EP1988023 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001354213 ; | [X]GB993003 (NESTLE SA) [X] 1,12 * page 2, lines 5-10 *; | [A]EP0337010 (FBI BRANDS LTD [CA]) [A] 1,12* column 1, lines 33-39 *; | [Y]EP0661208 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]) [Y] 4,6,15,17 * abstract *; | [XY]US2004131735 (KORENGEL JEFF L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12,13,16,18,19 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,14,15,17 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001354213 A 20011225 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 3,6,14,17 * abstract * |