EP1632374 - Air conditioning system for a vehicle with engine-independent cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heberle, Arthur, Dr.-Ing. Husarenweg 20 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Weinbrenner, Marcus Lindenbachstrasse 69 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Mantel, Berthold Friedrich Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/10] | Application number, filing date | 05016541.4 | 29.07.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | DE20041042678 | 01.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004042678 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632374 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
B60H1/00207 (EP,US);
B60H1/323 (EP,US);
F25B41/00 (EP,US);
F25B2400/06 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Standklimaanlage | [2006/10] | English: | Air conditioning system for a vehicle with engine-independent cooling | [2006/10] | French: | Système de climatisation pour véhicule avec mode autonome | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19917811 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10224754 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,7-10* figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE10242369 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-10 * paragraph [0043]; figures 7-10 * [A] 5 |