EP1621341 - Lithographic printing plate precursor and lithographic printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshi, Satoshi Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Aoshima, Norio Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Yumoto, Masatoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | 05 /
Ito, Koreshige c/o Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2014/09] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Hoshi, Satoshi Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
02 /
Shimada, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Aoshima, Norio Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | |||
04 /
Yumoto, Masatoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | |||
05 /
Ito, Koreshige c/o Fuji Photo Film Co Ltd 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016622.2 | 29.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | JP20040222932 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004222932 | JP20040264982 | 13.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004264982 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621341 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621341 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621341 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/04 (EP,US);
B41C2201/06 (EP,US);
B41C2201/10 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Lithographischer Druckplattenvorläufer und lithographisches Druckverfahren | [2006/05] | English: | Lithographic printing plate precursor and lithographic printing method | [2006/05] | French: | Précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique et procédé d'impression lithographique | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2005 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | IE | 29.07.2014 | LU | 29.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | FR | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.07.2005 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0949088 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP1108534 (CREO S R L [IN]); | [XD]JP2004098555 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]US2004091810 (YUMOTO MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [PX]EP1442877 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS464605B | GB434875 | US2714066 | US2800457 | US2800458 | US2833827 | JPS369163B | JPS3622063B | GB930422 | JPS3819574B | US3111407 | GB952807 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3287154 | JPS42446B | US3418250 | US3458311 | US3479185 | US3660304 | GB1303578 | JPS4836281 | US3796696 | JPS4970702 | US3881924 | US3902734 | US3905815 | US3914511 | JPS519079B | US4001140 | US4025455 | US4069055 | US4069056 | US4087376 | US4089802 | JPS53133428 | JPS547095B | US4153461 | JPS5463902 | JPS5532070 | JPS5549729B | US4283475 | US4311783 | US4327169 | JPS57142645 | JPS58112793 | JPS58112792 | JPS58125246 | JPS58173696 | JPS58181051 | JPS58181690 | JPS58194595 | JPS58220143 | JPS58224793 | JPS5941363 | JPS5948187 | EP0104143 | JPS5973996 | JPS5984248 | JPS5984249 | JPS5984356 | JPS59146063 | JPS59146061 | JPS59152396 | JPS59216146 | JPS6052940 | JPS6063744 | JPS6078787 | JPS60168144 | JPS60239736 | JPS61151197 | JPS61166544 | JPS61169835 | JPS61169837 | US4622286 | JPS629285B | JPS6258241 | JPS62143044 | JPS62150242 | JPS62170950 | US4689272 | EP0233567 | JPS62212401 | JPS62226143 | JPS62293247 | JPS6341484 | US4734444 | JPS6370243 | US4756993 | US4760013 | JPS63298339 | EP0297443 | EP0297442 | JPH01152109 | JPH01304453 | JPH02249 | JPH024705 | EP0370693 | JPH02150848 | US4933377 | EP0390214 | JPH02296514 | JPH02304441 | US5156938 | JPH04365049 | JPH0513514B | JPH0545885 | JPH0561214 | JPH0519702B | JPH0583588 | JPH0635174 | JPH06157623 | JPH06175564 | JPH06175561 | JPH06175554 | JPH06175553 | JPH06348011 | JPH071849 | JPH071850 | JPH0721633B | JPH07128785 | JPH07140589 | JPH07292014 | JPH07306527 | JPH08108621 | JPH09188685 | JPH09188686 | JPH09188710 | JPH106468 | JP2764769B | JPH10282679 | JPH1170756 | JP2938397B | JP2000039711 | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | JP2000131837 | JP2000147763 | JP2001199175 | JP2001253181 | JP2001277740 | JP2001277742 | JP2001322365 | JP2001343742 | JP2002079772 | JP2002107916 | JP2002116539 | JP2002148790 | JP2002278057 | JP2002287334 | JP2003328465 | JP2004098555 |