EP1628192 - Circuit for a module connectable on a databus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Technologies Sarl Z.A. La Piece 16 1180 Rolle / CH | [2010/11] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Honeywell Technologies Sarl Route du Bois 37 1024 Ecublens / CH | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states HONEYWELL B.V. Laarderhoogtweg 18-20 1101 EA Amsterdam Z.O. / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vegter, Derk Zijtak W.Z. 130 7833 BH Nieuw Amsterdam / NL | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016737.8 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | DE20041040324 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004040324 | [2006/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628192 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1628192 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | G06F1/18 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/45] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltung für an einen Datenbus anschliessbare Module | [2006/08] | English: | Circuit for a module connectable on a databus | [2006/08] | French: | Circuit pour un module connectable à un bus de données | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0836286 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 2-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 52 *; | [XI]WO9946868 (AMPCONTROL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 17 * [I] 2-8; | [A]US2003079070 (CHO JEFFREY C [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]DE10257632 (ZENTR MIKROELEKT DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0069] * |