EP1627785 - Inter-device communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2009/47] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 488-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morishita, Taiji c/o DENSO CORPORATION Int. Property 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016854.1 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040241149 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004241149 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627785 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627785 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B60S1/0818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/43] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem zwischen Geräten | [2006/08] | English: | Inter-device communication system | [2006/08] | French: | Système de communication entre dispositifs | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6056654 ; | [A]US4595866 (FUKATSU YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0485857 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 23; figure - * [A] 5,7; | [A]US5200676 (MUELLER DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850807), vol. 009, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 402), & JP60056654 A 19850402 (DAIHATSU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0485857 |