EP1632200 - Carpometacarpal thumb joint prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESKA Implants GmbH & Co. KG Grapengiesserstrasse 34 23556 Lübeck / DE | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states ESKA Implants GmbH & Co. Grapengiesserstrasse 34 23556 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grundei, Hans, Dr.-Ing. Hamburger Strasse 89 23558 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Aschoff, Horst-Heinrich, Dr. med. Finkenberg 42 23558 Lübeck / DE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016868.1 | 03.08.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | DE20041043006 | 02.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004043006 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632200 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/4241 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/305 (EP);
A61F2002/30614 (EP);
A61F2002/30662 (EP);
A61F2002/30845 (EP);
A61F2002/30884 (EP);
A61F2002/30909 (EP);
A61F2002/3092 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Title | German: | Daumensattelgelenkprothese | [2006/10] | English: | Carpometacarpal thumb joint prosthesis | [2006/10] | French: | Prothèse pour articulation carpo-métacarpienne | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2049435 (LAURE PROSTHETICS) [A] 1,5,6 * figure -; claims 1,10 * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 52 - line 70 *; | [X]US4955916 (CARIGNAN ROGER G [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure - * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 34 *; | [A]FR2720628 (PROVIS SA [FR]); | [X]FR2828092 (VALENTI PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figure -; claims 1,2,4,12 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 7 * * page 9, line 2 - line 8 * |