EP1749946 - Device for connecting beams and pillars or similar structural elements, particularly for prefabricated concrete structural elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zambelli, Sergio Via Stezzano, 28 24050 Zanica (Bergamo) / IT | For all designated states Zambelli, Benito Via Roma, 44 24050 Zanica (Bergamo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states Zambelli, Sergio Via Stezzano, 28 24050 Zanica (Bergamo) / IT | ||
For all designated states Zambelli, Benito Via Roma 44 24050 Zanica (Bergamo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05017043.0 | 05.08.2005 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749946 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749946 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/21, E04B1/22 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
E04B1/22 (EP);
E04B1/215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verbindung von Trägern und Pfeilern oder ähnlichen Bauelementen, insbesondere vorgefertigten Bauelementen aus Beton | [2007/06] | English: | Device for connecting beams and pillars or similar structural elements, particularly for prefabricated concrete structural elements | [2007/06] | French: | Dispositif pour la connection de poutres et colonnes ou d'éléments de construction similaires, en particulier des éléments de construction préfabriqués en béton | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2005 | AT | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 05.08.2012 | IE | 05.08.2012 | LU | 05.08.2012 | ES | 06.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
ES | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
ES | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
ES | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2179115 (PARTEK AB) [A] 15* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5669189 (LOGIADIS IOANNIS [GR], et al) [Y] 11 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP1092814 (ZAMBELLI SERGIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13,17,19-22 * figures 4-6 * [Y] 11 | by applicant | EP1092814 |