EP1642819 - Swing arm supporting structure for motorcycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kofuji, Kenji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05017975.3 | 18.08.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | JP20040284383 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004284383 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642819 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642819 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62M17/00, B62K25/28 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
B62M17/00 (EP);
B62K25/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwingarm-Tragkonstruktion für Motorräder | [2006/14] | English: | Swing arm supporting structure for motorcycle | [2006/14] | French: | Structure de support de bras oscillant pour motocyclette | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01085888 ; | [AD]JP2002087364 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 17, & JP01085888 A 19890330 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002087364 A 20020327 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2002087364 |