EP1647322 - Scrubber for cleaning or humidifying air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airmaster GmbH Innere Industriestrasse 22 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2006/33] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Edgar Emele Kunststofftechnik Präzisionsformen GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Nol 33 86179 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchner, Heinz Flurweg 21 84069 Schierling / DE | 02 /
Müller, Erwin Am Moosacker 25 86399 Bobingen / DE | 03 /
Emele, Edgar c/o Edgar Emele Beteiligungs GmbH Auf dem Nol 33 86179 Augsburg / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg) Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018002.5 | 18.08.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041050401 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050401 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1647322 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1647322 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/18, F24F3/16, F24F6/16 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B01D47/18 (EP);
F24F8/00 (EP,US);
B01D53/18 (EP);
F24F8/117 (EP);
F24F8/125 (EP,US);
F24F8/96 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftwäschegerät zur Luftreinigung und/oder Luftbefeuchtung | [2006/16] | English: | Scrubber for cleaning or humidifying air | [2006/16] | French: | Epurateur pour purifier ou humecter l'air | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3149626 (WENTLING WILLIAM H, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 2, lines 14-19 * * column 3, lines 41-49; figure - *; | [X]FR1452040 (PANSARD JEAN) [X] 1-11 * page 2, column R, line 25 - page 3, column L, line 16; figure 3 *; | [X]US3456927 (MARTIN WARNER W, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1778610 (DEFENSOR AG) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 14; figures 1-4; claim 18 *; | [X]US3733062 (BRACICH L) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3601984 (POLITECHNIKA LODZKA [PL]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4417443 (DOELCO EXQUISIT INH ALFRED DOE [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0908216 (DEL BEN SANTE [IT]) [X] 1-8* the whole document *; | [PX]DE202005005563U (BUCHNER HEINZ [DE]) [PX] 1-11 * page 7, paragraphs 50,51 * * page 8, paragraph 62; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE2205600 | EP0118811 | EP1141583 |