EP1645616 - Power transmission fluids with enhanced antishudder durability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Afton Chemical Corporation 500 Spring Street Richmond, VA 23219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Afton Chemical Corporation 500 Spring Street Richmond VA 23219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozbalik, Nubar 11403 Pineridge Lane Midlothian Virginia 23113 / US | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC, p/o De Vries & Metman, Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 05018147.8 | 22.08.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | US20040961779 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 961779 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645616 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/44, C10M135/32, C10M141/06, C10M141/08, C07D233/16 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C10M141/08 (EP,US);
C10M125/20 (KR);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C10M135/32 (EP,US);
C10M141/06 (EP,US);
C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10M2215/224 (EP,US);
C10M2219/09 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Kraftübertragungsflüssigkeiten mit verbesserter dauerhafter Schwingungsdämpfung | [2006/15] | English: | Power transmission fluids with enhanced antishudder durability | [2006/15] | French: | Fluides de transmission d'energie presentant une durabilite amelioree contre les vibrations | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB684640 (SOCONY VACUUM OIL CO INC) [X] 1-19,27-29,33-36 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 107 * * page 4, line 6 - line 108 * * page 5, line 21 - line 55 * * page 6, line 50 - page 8, line 15 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]US4709045 (KUBO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * column 1, line 55 - column 6, line 43 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1233054 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [X] 1-26,37 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] ** example -; claim - *; | [X]US2003092585 (O'CONNOR BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-20,24 * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0125] * * claim - * * paragraph [0021] * |