EP1630736 - Reverse auction control method, computer program product, and server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeeCorp Limited Minami-Azabu 5-2-32 Minatu-Ku, Tokyo 106-0047 / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabata, Izumi c/o DeeCorp Limited Minami-Azabu 5-2-32 Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0047 / JP | 02 /
Furuichi, Katsuhisa c/o DeeCorp Limited Minami-Azabu 5-2-32 Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0047 / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018210.4 | 22.08.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040241872 | 23.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004241872 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630736 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Umgekehrtes Versteigerungssteuerungsverfahren, Computerprogrammprodukt und Server | [2006/09] | English: | Reverse auction control method, computer program product, and server | [2006/09] | French: | Procédé de command de mise aux enchères inversées, programme informatique, et serveur | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |