EP1696717 - Electric range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Byeong Wook 708-802, Haan Jugong 7-danji Apt. Haan 3-dong Gwangmyeong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwag, Dong Seong 103-1704, Joongang-Heights Vill Apt. 1140, Doksan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul / KR | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018295.5 | 23.08.2005 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | KR20050015888 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: KR 2005015888 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696717 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696717 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696717 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H01L23/40, H05B3/74 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
H01L23/3672 (EP,US);
H01L23/34 (KR);
H01L23/36 (KR);
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H05B6/1263 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4031 (EP,US);
H01L2023/405 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4062 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05B2206/022 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/29] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisches Gerät | [2006/35] | English: | Electric range | [2006/35] | French: | Appareil électrique | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 13.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8904593 (SAAB SCANIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-11* page 4, line 8 - line 27; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0573167 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-11 * column 3, line 40 - line 55; figure 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]US5459640 (MOUTRIE MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US6049459 (EDMONDS GARY M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 4; figure 2 *; | [YA]DE10163839 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8-11 * paragraph [0025]; figure 5 * [A] 6,7 | by applicant | WO8904593 | EP0573167 | US5459640 | US6049459 | DE10163839 |