EP1632754 - Method and device for precise determination of an angle of rotation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippuner, Heinz Im Fuertli 9 9445 Rebstein / CH | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Susanne Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Kaminski, Susanne Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 05018461.3 | 25.08.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | CH20040001463 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: CH 14632004 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632754 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1632754 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G01D5/3473 (EP,US);
G01D5/34707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum genauen Bestimmen eines Drehwinkels | [2006/10] | English: | Method and device for precise determination of an angle of rotation | [2006/10] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la détermination précise d'un angle de rotation | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | LV | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | BG | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03170010 ; | [A]JPS6031011 ; | [DA]DE1811961 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6031011 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US4518859 (HOSHIKA SHUJI [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 4 * * column 6, line 41 - line 66 *; | [DA]US4547667 (SASAKI TSUNEO [JP], et al) [DA] 1,6 * figures 6,13 *; | [A]JPH03170010 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [DA]US5214426 (MINOHARA KIYOMI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,6 * figures 10-16 *; | [X]US2004118999 (HORTON STEVEN JOHN [GB]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0019] - [0025] - [0031] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911023), vol. 015, no. 418, Database accession no. (P - 1266), & JP03170010 A 19910723 (OKUMA MACH WORKS LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850629), vol. 009, no. 156, Database accession no. (P - 368), & JP60031011 A 19850216 (ASAHI KOUGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | DE1811961 | US4580047 |