EP1619798 - Semiconductor integrated circuit, logic operation circuit, and flip flop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zama, Hedemasa 435CreareToshibaMotosumiyoshi Kizuki-sumiyoshi-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Koizumi, Masayuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Yukiko 11-15, Nobi 1-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Usami, Kimiyoshi 12-13, Shirata-Mukaicho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kawabe, Naoyuki, 302, Toshiba-Nakanocho-Apart. 8-3, Komurai-Nakanocho Sawai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Kanazawa, Masahiro F-213,31, Nishi-Shiba 2-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Furusawa, Toshiyuki 8-3, Minami-Suna 7-chome Koto-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
Zama, Hedemasa 435CreareToshibaMotosumiyoshi Kizuki-sumiyoshi-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Koizumi, Masayuki, 204, Namamugi-Yuri-Heights 4-13,Namamugi 3-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Yukiko 11-15, Nobi 1-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Usami, Kimiyoshi 12-13, Shirata-Mukaicho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Kawabe, Naoyuki, 302, Toshiba-Nakanocho-Apart. 8-3, Komurai-Nakanocho Sawai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Kanazawa, Masahiro F-213,31, Nishi-Shiba 2-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Furusawa, Toshiyuki 8-3, Minami-Suna 7-chome Koto-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018764.0 | 20.06.2001 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | JP20000184398 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000184398 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619798 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00, H03K19/094, H01L21/822 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H03K19/01707 (EP,US);
H03K19/00 (KR);
H03K19/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] | Title | German: | Integrierte Halbleiterschaltung, logische Schaltung und Kippschaltung | [2006/04] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit, logic operation circuit, and flip flop | [2006/04] | French: | Circuit semi-conducteur intégré, circuit logique et bascule | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01113682.7 / EP1170865 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |