EP1760453 - Photelectric hand held system and optical system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GretagMacbeth AG Althardstrasse 70 8105 Regensdorf / CH | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Vries, Loris Oberdorfstrasse 16 8107 Buchs / CH | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018942.2 | 31.08.2005 | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1760453 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, G01J3/10 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G01N21/272 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/0235 (EP,US);
G01J3/0272 (EP,US);
G01J3/0289 (EP,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,US);
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/51 (EP,US);
G01J3/524 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/46] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fotoelektrisches Handmessgerät und optische Messeinheit dafür | [2007/10] | English: | Photelectric hand held system and optical system therefor | [2007/10] | French: | Systéme photoélectrique portable et système optique associé | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 09.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4003660 (CHRISTIE JR JOHN S, et al) [X] 1-29 * column 5, line 42 - column 7, line 66; figures 1-4,6 *; | [A]US6031617 (BERG BERNARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 5, line 17 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002167669 (SCHWARZ PETER [DE]) [A] 1-29* column 9, paragraph 193 - column 10, paragraph 205; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003132982 (TANDON JAGDISH C [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * paragraph [0092]; figures 1,2 * |