EP1634755 - Vehicle including a device to supply air to a transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prys, Gerhard Salzstrasse 62 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
Riederer, Stefan Eigenheimstrasse 31 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [2006/11] | Application number, filing date | 05018974.5 | 01.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | DE20041044321 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044321 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634755 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1634755 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634755 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B60K17/00 (EP);
B60K11/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit einer Einrichtung zum Zuführen von Luft zu einem Getriebe | [2006/11] | English: | Vehicle including a device to supply air to a transmission | [2006/11] | French: | Véhicule avec dispositif d'alimentation d'air vers une transmission | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 25.08.2008 | [2008/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0391391 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2342328 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 9 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [DA]DE19904515 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1,9* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19904515 |