EP1632961 - Thick-film resistor paste and thick-film resistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hirobumi c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Igarashi, Katsuhiko c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019023.0 | 01.09.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | JP20040254199 | 01.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004254199 | JP20050067192 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005067192 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632961 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1632961 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/065, H01C7/00, C03C8/00 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
H01C17/065 (KR);
C03C14/004 (EP,US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C03C8/20 (EP,US);
H01C17/06533 (EP,US);
H01C17/075 (KR);
H01C7/003 (EP,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Title | German: | Dickschichtwiderstandspaste und ein Dickschichtwiderstand | [2006/52] | English: | Thick-film resistor paste and thick-film resistor | [2006/10] | French: | Pâte pour résistance à couche épaisse et résistance à couche épaisse | [2006/10] |
Former [2006/10] | Paste zur Herstellung eines Dickschichtwiderstands und ein Dickschicktwiderstand hieraus hergestellt | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | BE | 06.06.2007 | CH | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | IT | 06.06.2007 | LI | 06.06.2007 | LT | 06.06.2007 | LV | 06.06.2007 | NL | 06.06.2007 | PL | 06.06.2007 | RO | 06.06.2007 | SI | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | LU | 01.09.2007 | IE | 03.09.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | IS | 06.10.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | HU | 07.12.2007 | FR | 01.02.2008 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
FR | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
FR | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
FR | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LV | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IS | 06.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
PL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55130101 ; | [A]US5277844 (RAINEY CLIFFORD S [US]) [A] 1-23 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0718855 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-23* claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6037045 (FUKAYA MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-23 * claims 1,3 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 47, Database accession no. 1980-83473C, XP002353233 & JPS55130101 A 19801008 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2003197405 |