EP1634952 - Corynebacterium glutamicum genes encoding proteins involved in membrane synthesis and membrane transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paik Kwang Industrial Co., Ltd. 31 Soryong-dong, Gunsan-si Jeollabuk-do / KR | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pompejus, Markus, Dr. 401, Bau Haus 653-15 Hannam-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-210 / KR | 02 /
Kröger, Burkhard, Dr. Im Waldhof 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Schröder, Hartwig, Dr. Benzstrasse 4 69226 Nussloch / DE | 04 /
Zelder, Oskar, Dr. Franz-Stützel-Strasse 8 67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
Haberhauer, Gregor Speyererstrasse 45 a 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019191.5 | 23.06.2000 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | US19990141031P | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 141031 P | DE19991031454 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931454 | DE19991031478 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931478 | DE19991031563 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931563 | DE19991032122 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932122 | DE19991032124 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932124 | DE19991032125 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932125 | DE19991032128 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932128 | DE19991032180 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932180 | DE19991032182 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932182 | DE19991032190 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932190 | DE19991032191 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932191 | DE19991032209 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932209 | DE19991032212 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932212 | DE19991032227 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932227 | DE19991032228 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932228 | DE19991032229 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932229 | DE19991032230 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932230 | DE19991032927 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932927 | DE19991033005 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933005 | DE19991033006 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933006 | DE19991040764 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940764 | DE19991040765 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940765 | DE19991040766 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940766 | DE19991040830 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940830 | DE19991040831 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940831 | DE19991040832 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940832 | DE19991040833 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940833 | DE19991041378 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941378 | DE19991041379 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941379 | DE19991041395 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941395 | DE19991042077 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942077 | DE19991042078 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942078 | DE19991042079 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942079 | DE19991042088 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942088 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634952 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1634952 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/52, C12N9/00, C07K14/34 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C07K14/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | 29.09.2006 | LT | 29.09.2006 | LV | 29.09.2006 | MK | 29.09.2006 | RO | 29.09.2006 | SI | 29.09.2006 | Title | German: | GENE KODIERENDE FÜR PROTEINE AUS CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM, DIE AN DER HOMÖOSTASE UND ADAPTIERUNG BETEILIGT SIND | [2006/12] | English: | Corynebacterium glutamicum genes encoding proteins involved in membrane synthesis and membrane transport | [2006/11] | French: | Gènes codants pour des protéines de Corynebacterium glutamicum, qui participent à l'homéostasie et à l'adaptation | [2006/11] |
Former [2006/11] | Gene kodierende für Proteine aus Corynebacterium Glutamicum, die an der Homöostase und Adaptierung beteiligt sind | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2008 | 19.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/09] | 23.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00939001.4 / EP1255839 | Request for further processing for: | 22.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1108790 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-32* page 84; table 1; sequences 943,4443 *; | [X] - "Protein cysQ homolog.", UniProt, (19951101), Database accession no. CYSQ_MYCLE, URL: EBI, XP002362726 [X] 15-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Mycobacterium leprae cosmid B2126.", EMBL, (19940122), Database accession no. ML017, URL: EBI, XP002362727 [X] 3,4,15-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "S.alboniger napH, pur7, pur10, pur6, pur4, pur5 and pur3 genes", EMBL, (19951030), Database accession no. X92429, URL: EBI, XP002362728 [X] 3,4,15-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Agrobacterium tumefaciens Ti plasmid pTiC58 T-DNA region", EMBL, (19990609), Database accession no. ATU237588, URL: EBI, XP002362729 [X] 3,4,15-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Saccharothrix mutabilis subsp. capreolus A201A biosynthetic gene cluster", EMBL, (19950210), Database accession no. SCARD1GN, URL: EBI, XP002362730 [X] 3,4,15-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Rhizobium leguminosarum pssB, pssA(pss4) and ORF 1-2 genes, complete cds's.", EMBL, (19951118), Database accession no. RLPSSB, URL: EBI, XP002362731 [X] 3,4,15-17 * the whole document * | [AD] - "Mycobacterium tuberculosis H37Rv complete genome; segment 96/162.", NUCLEOTIDE, (19990210), Database accession no. Z95388, URL: NCBI, XP002363049 [AD] * column A * | [A] - "CYSQ PROTEIN from E. coli", PROTEIN, (19981215), Database accession no. P22255, URL: NCBI, XP002363103 [A] * column A * | [A] - NEUWALD A F ET AL, "cysQ, a gene needed for cysteine synthesis in Escherichia coli K-12 only during aerobic growth.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY. JAN 1992, (199201), vol. 174, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 415 - 425, XP002362713 | [A] - VAN DOMMELEN A ET AL, "(Methyl)ammonium transport in the nitrogen-fixing bacterium Azospirillum brasilense.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY. MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 180, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2652 - 2659, XP002362714 | [PX] - "Protein cysQ homolog.", UniProt, (20000530), Database accession no. P65163, URL: EBI, XP002362732 [PX] 15-17 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Protein cysQ homolog.", UniProt, (20000530), Database accession no. P65164, URL: EBI, XP002362733 [PX] 15-17 * the whole document * | [ ] - "C glutamicum protein fragment SEQ ID NO: 4443.", Geneseq, (20010926), Database accession no. AAG90689, URL: EBI | [ ] - "C glutamicum coding sequence fragment SEQ ID NO: 7061.", Geneseq, (20010926), Database accession no. AAH68526, URL: EBI |