EP1642517 - Container removably associated to a ceiling and method for stowing objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spalmach, Umberto Via Saliceto e Monticello 48 43010 Mulazzano PR / IT | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 05019199.8 | 05.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | IT2004PR00067 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: IT PR20040067 | [2006/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642517 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47B51/00, E04B9/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
E04B9/006 (EP);
A47B51/00 (EP);
E04B9/003 (EP);
A47B2051/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | An einer Decke lösbar verbundener Behälter und Verfahren zum Verstauen von Objekten | [2006/14] | English: | Container removably associated to a ceiling and method for stowing objects | [2006/14] | French: | Conteneur relié amoviblement au plafond et procédé pour ranger des objets | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2599605 (PICARD DU CHAMBON CLAUDINE [FR]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 5 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3940446 (ARMO BAUELEMENTE [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 10, line 16 - line 41 * * figures 3,5,6,13-15 *; | [X]FR2648799 (TOUT POUR LE GRAIN [FR]) [X] 1-8,10 * page 4, line 13 - line 35 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 4 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5011239 (GUERIN GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-6,10 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 5 * * figure - *; | [X]WO9409230 (ARMO BAUELEMENTE [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * figure - *; | [X]US5407261 (MERCER GLENN E [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * column 2, line 6 - line 59 * * figure - *; | [X]US5475949 (MCCOY NEVILLE W [US]) [X] 1-5,10 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 42 - line 63 * * column 5, line 12 - line 25 ** figure - *; | [X]US2004123781 (D AGOSTINO JAMES [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0027] - [0033] * * figure - * |