EP1635469 - Pipelined a/d converter and method for correcting output of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiro, Dosho 3-3-5-202 Hachizuka Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-0024 / JP | 02 /
Takashi, Morie 2-9-6-403 Masago Ikeda-shi Osaka 567-0851 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019242.6 | 05.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20040260504 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004260504 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635469 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1635469 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H03M1/1038 (EP,US);
H03M1/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/11] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fliessband-A/D-Wandler und Verfahren zu dessen Korrektur | [2006/11] | English: | Pipelined a/d converter and method for correcting output of the same | [2006/11] | French: | Convertisseur A/N série-séquentiel et procédé pour sa correction | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.02.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.02.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0536504 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 6,10-13 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 16 - line 30 * * page 6, line 45 - line 46 * * page 8, line 42 - page 9, line 57 *; | [A]US5635937 (LIM SHIN-IL [KR], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * figure 6 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]US6489904 (HISANO SHINICHI [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * figure 19 * * column 1, line 8 - line 11 * * column 2, line 42 - line 60 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 16 *; | [A] - PROVOST B ET AL, "A PRACTICAL SELF-CALIBRATION SCHEME IMPLEMENTATION FOR PIPELINE ADC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200404), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 448 - 456, XP001198418 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 448, column 2, line 19 - line 23 * * page 448, column 2, line 31 - line 36 * * page 448, column 2, line 40 - page 449, column 1, line 14 * * page 450, column 2, line 32 - page 451, column 1, line 14 * * page 453, column 2, line 23 - line 37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIM.2004.823317 | [A] - YUN CHIU, "Inherently Linear Capacitor Error-Averaging Techniques for Pipelined A/D Conversion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200003), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 1057-7130, XP011013191 [A] * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 231, column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 42 * |