EP1763015 - Systems and methods for generating reference voltages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppoly Optoelectronics Corp. 12, Ke Jung Road, Science-Based Industrial Pk. Chu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Ching-Wei 212, Lung-Sham St Tou-Yuan City Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 02 /
Jan, Chueh-Kuei 1F, Nr 5, Lane 130, Sec. 1 Tonghe E.St Shihlin District Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Hsieh, Meng-Hsun 34, Yungnan St North District Tai-Chung City / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
Lin, Ching-Wei 212, Lung-Sham St Tou-Yuan City Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | ||
02 /
Jan, Chueh-Kuei 1F, Nr 5, Lane 130, Sec. 1 Tonghe E.St Shihlin District Taipei City / TW | |||
03 /
Hsieh, Meng-Hsun 34, Yungnan St North District Tai-Chung City / TW | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019572.6 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763015 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/3696 (EP);
G09G2320/0219 (EP);
G09G2330/021 (EP);
G09G2340/0428 (EP);
G09G3/3611 (EP);
G09G3/3614 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/47] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Referenzspannungen | [2007/11] | English: | Systems and methods for generating reference voltages | [2007/11] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour générer des tensions de référence | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 14.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP2004348122 [ ]; | [A]US2002097208 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0088] , [0120] - [0122] - [0129] , [0130] , [0152] - [0323]; figures 9-13,18-20,23 *; | [A]EP1335344 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0086] , [0094] , [0097] , [0136] - [0139]; figures 6,7,11 *; | [X]WO2004059603 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 14, line 18 - line 25 * * page 18, line 9 - page 26, line 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2004348122 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0046]; figure 1 * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004348122 A 20041209 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * |