EP1638173 - Explosion-proof electrical installations, especially lights and junction boxes, in controlled circuits with connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BöSha GmbH + Co. KG Industriegebiet Heidberg 10 59602 Rüthen / DE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shahrokhshahi, Davoud Overhagener Str. 133 59557 Lippstadt / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 15 80 59705 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019605.4 | 09.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | DE20041045455 | 17.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045455 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638173 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1638173 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/533, F21V25/04, F21V25/12 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
F21V25/12 (EP);
H01R13/7036 (EP);
H01R33/965 (EP);
H01R13/5213 (EP);
H01R13/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Explosionsgeschützte elektrische Betriebsmittel, insbesondere Leuchten und Verteilerkästen, in überwachten Stromkreisen mit Steckverbindungen | [2006/12] | English: | Explosion-proof electrical installations, especially lights and junction boxes, in controlled circuits with connectors | [2006/12] | French: | Installations électriques antidéflagrants, en particulier lumières et boîtes de jonction, dans circuits électriques avec connecteurs | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1790107 (MICHAS VASSILIOS SP) [X] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [X]DE2450454 (WALTHER F WERKE) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [XY]GB2214004 (NL PETROLEUM SERVICES [GB]) [X] 1,2 * figure 4 * [Y] 10; | [X]EP0402055 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0471943 (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0478172 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 5-7 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0501654 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 24 - line 29 *; | [XAY]DE19838492 (STAHL R SCHALTGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 8,9,12-14 [Y] 3-7,10,11; | [Y]WO0117070 (CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 3-7* figures 1-3,13 *; | [X]US2002039851 (MOU ZHIQUAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 6 *; | [XY]US2002151225 (RAMOS PHILLIP M [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 8 * [Y] 5-7,10,11; | [X]WO2004019455 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 * |