EP1641311 - Fault isolation mechanisms for POTS emulation service on an FTTx platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dharanikota, Sudheer 111 Fieldbrook Court Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Corporate Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019618.7 | 09.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | US20040611986P | 22.09.2004 Original published format: US 611986 P | US20050217953 | 01.09.2005 Original published format: US 217953 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641311 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641311 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H04Q11/045 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1301 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1316 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13335 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13348 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Fehlerisolationsmechanismen für einen POTS-Emulationsdienst auf einer FTTx-Plattform | [2006/13] | English: | Fault isolation mechanisms for POTS emulation service on an FTTx platform | [2006/13] | French: | Mécanismes d'isolation d'erreurs pour un service d'émulation POTS sur une plate-forme FTTx | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002120758 (CHANG TSUNG-SHIEN [TW]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 8 ** page 3, paragraph 47 *; | [A]US2004062204 (BEARDEN MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 26 * * page 3, paragraphs 42,43 * * page 4, paragraphs 51-54 * * figures 1,3; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | US2002120758 | US2004062204 |