EP1643211 - Measuring method and device for determining the depth of an erosion as it forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Hamburg-Harburg Schwarzenbergstrasse 95 21073 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states TuTech Innovation GmbH Harburger Schlossstrasse 6-12 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grabe, Jürgen, Univ.-Prof. Dr.-Ing. Haselhain 3 21075 Hamburg / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019726.8 | 10.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20041047529 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004047529 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643211 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643211 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643211 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C13/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
G01C13/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Messverfahren und -vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Tiefe eines sich ausbildenden Kolkes | [2006/14] | English: | Measuring method and device for determining the depth of an erosion as it forms | [2006/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure pour déterminer la profondeur d'une érosion qui se forme | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | LT | 29.07.2009 | LV | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | AT | 10.09.2009 | LU | 10.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GB | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | IS | 29.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.09.2009 | ||
LU | 10.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GB | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.09.2009 | ||
LU | 10.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GB | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GB | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GB | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD42194 (LEMKE FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,11,13,16,17,19* column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 29; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE3526427 (GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 30 - line 40 * * column 2, line 23 - line 26 * * figure 1; claim 5 * [Y] 15; | [XY]US5479724 (NAHAJSKI ANTHONY P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,11,12,16,17,19 * column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 19; figures 1-5 * * column 4, line 26 - line 28 * [Y] 15 | by applicant | US5479724 |