EP1621639 - A novel method of diagnosing, monitoring and staging prostate cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diadexus, Inc. 343 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ali, Shujath 208 Mulberry Place Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 02 /
Salceda, Susana 4118 Cresendo Avenue San Jose CA 95136 / US | 03 /
Sun, Yongming 551 Shoal Circle Redwood City, CA 94064 / US | 04 /
Cafferkey, Robert Apartment 4305 651 Franklin Street Mountain View CA 94041 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
Ali, Shujath Apartment 357 3475 Granada Avenue Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
Salceda, Susana 4118 Cresendo Avenue San Jose CA 95136 / US | |||
03 /
Sun, Yongming 551 Shoal Circle Redwood City, CA 94064 / US | |||
04 /
Cafferkey, Robert Apartment 4305 651 Franklin Street Mountain View CA 94041 / US | |||
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Ali, Shujath Apartment 357 3475 Granada Avenue Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
Salceda, Susana 4118 Cresendo Avenue San Jose CA 95136 / US | |||
03 /
Sun, Yongming Apartment 260 869 S. Winchester Boulevard San Jose CA 95128 / US | |||
04 /
Cafferkey, Robert Apartment 4305 651 Franklin Street Mountain View CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05019760.7 | 12.05.1999 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US19980086265P | 21.05.1998 Original published format: US 86265 P | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621639 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621639 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, G01N33/567 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/05] | Title | German: | Neuartiges Verfahren zur Diagnose, zur Überwachung und Verlaufsbeobachtung von Prostatakrebs | [2006/05] | English: | A novel method of diagnosing, monitoring and staging prostate cancer | [2006/05] | French: | Nouveau procédé de diagnostic, de surveillance et de stadification du cancer de la prostate | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99921946.2 / EP1082460 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9836054 (AMRAD OPERATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [PX] 1-6 * page 28, line 1 - page 29, line 7 *; | [XP]WO9900498 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,7 * page 35, line 6 - page 38, line 23 *; | [PA] - INOUE M ET AL, "CLONING AND TISSUE DISTRIBUTION OF A NOVEL SERINE PROTEASE ESP-1 FROM HUMAN EOSINOPHILS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (1998), vol. 252, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 307 - 312, XP000891940 [PA] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9645 | [A] - "nh36a02.s1 NCI_CGAP_Pr3 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:954410 similar to TR:G1143194 G1143194 PROSTASIN. ;, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19970719), Database accession no. AA525010, URL: EBI, XP002402135 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [PA] - HOOPER J D ET AL, "Testisin, a new human serine proteinase expressed by premeiotic testicular germ cells and lost in testicular germ cell tumors", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19990701), vol. 59, no. 13, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3199 - 3205, XP002216249 [PA] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PRESCOTT J L ET AL, "Isolation and androgen regulation of the human homeobox cDNA, NKX3.1", PROSTATE, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0270-4137, (19980401), Database accession no. U80669, pages 71 - 80, URL: EMBL, XP002084750 [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0045(19980401)35:1<71::AID-PROS10>3.0.CO;2-H | [X] - HE W W ET AL, "a novel human prostate-specific androgen-regulated homeobox gene (NKX3.1) that maps to 8p21, a region frequently deleted in prostate cancer", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19970701), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 69 - 77, XP002084749 [X] 1-5,7 * Introduction * * page 72, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 73, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.4715 | [X] - VOELLER H J ET AL, "Coding region of NKX3.1, a prostate-specific homeobox gene on 8p21, is not mutated in human prostate cancers", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19971015), vol. 57, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4455 - 4459, XP002084751 [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * | [A] - EMBL, (19961217), Database accession no. U80669, URL: EMBL, XP002084746 [A] 1-5,7 * abstract * | [T] - EMBL, (20021015), Database accession no. NM_006167, URL: EMBL, XP002223221 [T] 1-5,7 * abstract * | [A] - OLSSON C A ET AL, "REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE-POLYMER CHAIN REACTION ASSAYS FOR PROSTATE CANCER", UROLOGIC CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, SAUNDERS CO., LONDON, GB, (199705), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0094-0143, XP002923009 [A] 1-7 * page 370, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 375, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0094-0143(05)70383-9 | [A] - FRIEDRICH B ET AL, "DIFFERENTIATION-STAGE SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF ONCOPROTEIN 18 IN HUMAN AND RAT PROSTATIC ADENOCARCINOMA", PROSTATE, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0270-4137, pages 102 - 109, XP000938476 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - BLOK L J ET AL, "ISOLATION OF CDNAS THAT ARE DIFFERENTIALLY EXPRESSED BETWEEN ANDROGEN-DEPENDENT AND ANDROGEN-INDEPENDENT PROSTATE CARCINOMA CELLS USING DIFFERENTIAL DISPLAY PCR", PROSTATE, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950401), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0270-4137, pages 213 - 224, XP000611577 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - CHANG GLENN T G ET AL, "Differentially expressed genes in androgen-dependent and -independent prostate carcinomas", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (1997), vol. 57, no. 18, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4075 - 4081, XP002147425 [A] 1-7 * abstract * |