EP1603350 - Communication system for forward link rate scheduling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jou, Yu-Chen 9979 Riverhead Drive San Diego California 92129 / US | 02 /
Lin, Yu-Chuan 585 W. 63rd Avenue Vancouver BC V¢P 2G7 / CA | 03 /
Odenwalder, Joseph, P. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
Tiedemann, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego California 92121 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
Jou, Yu-Chen 9979 Riverhead Drive San Diego California 92129 / US | ||
02 /
Lin, Yu-Chuan 585 W. 63rd Avenue Vancouver BC V^P 2G7 / CA | |||
03 /
Odenwalder, Joseph, P. 14967 Rancho Real Del Mar California 92014 / US | |||
04 /
Tiedemann, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019889.4 | 10.02.1998 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | US19970798951 | 11.02.1997 Original published format: US 798951 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1603350 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1603350 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603350 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38, H04B7/26, H04B7/005 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP,US);
H04B7/2659 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/281 (EP,US);
H04W52/34 (EP,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W72/563 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/49] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem für die Ablauffolgeplanung der Vorwärtsverbindungsrate | [2005/49] | English: | Communication system for forward link rate scheduling | [2005/49] | French: | Systeme de communication destine a la programmation de liaisons en aval | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98905048.9 / EP0897644 | Divisional application(s) | EP07005160.2 / EP1791374 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2007 | BE | 21.11.2007 | CH | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | LI | 21.11.2007 | LU | 10.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
LI | 21.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9507578 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 9 - line 13 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, line 33 - page 9, line 30 * * page 10, line 28 - page 14, line 2 * * figures 1,7-10; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0656716 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 39 - line 43 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9610305 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 * * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 29 - line 35 ** claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO9637081 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, line 2 - line 5 * * page 2, line 16 - page 10, line 26 * * page 12, line 20 - page 14, line 26 * * page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 23 * * page 19, line 15 - line 21 * * figures 1-9; claims 1-10 * |