EP1638127 - Plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Atsushi, c/o Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / JP | 02 /
Otani, Eishiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / JP | 03 /
Lin, Hai, c/o Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / JP | 04 /
Tsuchiya, Kunimoto, c/o Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
Hirota, Atsushi Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / US | ||
02 /
Otani, Eishiro Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / US | |||
03 /
Lin, Hai Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / US | |||
04 /
Tsuchiya, Kunimoto Pioneer Corporation 2680 Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken 409-3843 / US | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019917.3 | 13.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | JP20040269673 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004269673 | JP20050208719 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005208719 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638127 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1638127 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1638127 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/40 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plasma-Anzeigetafel | [2006/12] | English: | Plasma display panel | [2006/12] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1298694 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-14 *; | [PX]WO2005031782 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-24 * figure 1 *; | [E]EP1580786 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [E] 1-24 * figure 1; claims 1-9 *; | [E]EP1600921 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [E] 1-24 * figure 5; claims 1-10 *; | EP1667190 [ ] (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0014] - [0061]; figure 1 * |