EP1634707 - Ink jet head, control method therefor, and ink jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Yusuke c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Furukawa, Koji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019980.1 | 14.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20040266974 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004266974 | JP20040266975 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004266975 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634707 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634707 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/06 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B41J2/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlkopf, Steuerverfahren dafür und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | [2006/11] | English: | Ink jet head, control method therefor, and ink jet recording apparatus | [2006/11] | French: | Tête à jet d'encre, méthode associée de contrôle et dispositif d'enregistrement par jet d'encre | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2007 | BE | 21.11.2007 | CH | 21.11.2007 | CY | 21.11.2007 | CZ | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | EE | 21.11.2007 | FI | 21.11.2007 | LI | 21.11.2007 | LT | 21.11.2007 | LV | 21.11.2007 | NL | 21.11.2007 | PL | 21.11.2007 | RO | 21.11.2007 | SI | 21.11.2007 | SK | 21.11.2007 | TR | 21.11.2007 | BG | 21.02.2008 | SE | 21.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | ES | 04.03.2008 | IS | 21.03.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | HU | 22.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
HU | 22.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LV | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LT | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
PL | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IS | 21.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2000025233 ; | [A]JP2001030498 ; | [A]JP2000127408 ; | [A]EP0899106 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,15* the whole document *; | [A]WO02057086 (TONEJET CORP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 12 * * page 3, line 1 - line 33; figures 1-5 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000025233 A 20000125 (TOSHIBA CORP) [AD] 1,7,8,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001030498 A 20010206 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,7,8,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000127408 A 20000509 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,4,8,11,15 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000025233 | JP2003203824 |