EP1764741 - Method of determining the quality of an image captured by a digital camera, or by an electronic device enclosing or connectable to a digital camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gkikas, Karolos Irakleous 30 166 75 Glyfada Athen / GR | For all designated states Hao, He 42 Epping Avenue Eastwood NSW 2122 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Gkikas, Karolos Irakleous 30 166 75 Glyfada Athen / GR | ||
For all designated states Hao, He 42 Epping Avenue Eastwood NSW 2122 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft - Karakatsanis Occamstrasse 3 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Karakatsanis Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020060.9 | 15.09.2005 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764741 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung der Qualität einer Aufnahme, welche von einer Digitalkamera, von einem eine Digitalkamera umfassenden oder von einem mit einer Digitalkamera verbindbaren elektronischen Gerät erstellt worden ist | [2007/12] | English: | Method of determining the quality of an image captured by a digital camera, or by an electronic device enclosing or connectable to a digital camera | [2007/12] | French: | Méthode de détermination de la qualité d'une image prise par un appareil-photo numérique, ou par un dispositif électronique comprenant un, ou raccordable à un appareil-photo numérique | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 15.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/47] | 07.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2007 | 30.09.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5486893 (TAKAGI TADAO [JP]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]EP1280336 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0015] , [0059] , [0129] , [0130] *; | [A] - MURINO V ET AL, "Real-time adaptive regulation of a visual camera for automatic investigation of changing environments", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION, 1993. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IECON '93., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MAUI, HI, USA 15-19 NOV. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19931115), ISBN 0-7803-0891-3, pages 1633 - 1638, XP010109265 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [00II] * * page 1636, column R, lines 3-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1993.339318 |