EP1637685 - Window frame assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pro Tec Vinduer A/S Nybovej 34 7500 Holstebro / DK | [2009/32] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states P.T.V. Holding ApS Lyngbakken 8 7500 Holstebro / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koldtoft, Kristian Skoleparken 7 8310 Bedder / DK | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 05020079.9 | 15.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | DK20040001408 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: DK 200401408 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1637685 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1637685 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/20, E06B3/58 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
E06B3/58 (EP);
E06B3/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | Anordnung für Fensterrahmen | [2006/12] | English: | Window frame assembly | [2006/12] | French: | Ensemble cadre de fenêtre | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/29] | 29.05.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 29.05.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2184930 (THWAITES STEPHEN D [CA]) [A] 1-3 * page 15 - page 18 *; | [A]DE19754714 (PIP AG [CH]) [A] 6,8 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE20019100U (KRECKE EDMOND DOMINIQUE [LU]) [X] 1-9 * figure 2 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 4 *; | [A]US2002059759 (BIELEFELD HANS-WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 4,5 * page 1, paragraph 13 *; | [A]US2002124494 (ZEN VIC DE [CA]) [A] 6 * figure 7 ** page 1, paragraphs 6,7,9 *; | [X]US2003126812 (FOLSOM PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 2a * * claims 1,6,9,11,15 *; | [A]WO03087516 (INTERPANE GLASBESCHICHTUNGSGMB [DE]) [A] 9 * claims 1,7,10,11,14 * | by applicant | DK200400197U |