EP1638010 - Method and system for physiological signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ON Semiconductor Trading Ltd. 1 Lane Hill Hamma Building 3rd Floor Hamilton HM 19 / BM | [2011/43] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Emma Mixed Signal C.V. Naritaweg 165, Telestone 8 1043 BW Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheikhzadeh Nadjar, Hamid 580 Clipper Drive Waterloo Ontario N2K 4B4 / CA | 02 /
Brennan, Robert L. 42 Forest Breeze Court Kitchener Ontario N2N 3H9 / CA | 03 /
Johnson, Julie 3030 Prospect Street Apartment 4B Burlington Ontario L7N 2P5 / CA | 04 /
Cornu, Etienne 40 Wentworth Avenue Cambridge Ontario N1S 1G6 / CA | [2011/47] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
Sheikhzadeh Nadjar, Hamid 580 Clipper Drive Waterloo Ontario N2K 4B4 / CA | ||
02 /
Brennan, Robert L. 42 Forest Breeze Court Kitchener Ontario N2N 3H9 / CA | |||
03 /
Johnson, Julie 3030 Prospect Street Apartment 4B Burlington Ontario L7N 2P5 / CA | |||
04 /
Cornu, Etienne 40 Wentworth Avenue Cambridge Ontario N1S 1G6 / CA | |||
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
Sheikhzadeh Nadjar, Hamid 639-5 Albert Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3V5 / CA | ||
02 /
Brennan, Robert L. 42 Forest Breeze Court Kitchener Ontario N2N 3H9 / CA | |||
03 /
Johnson, Julie 3030 Prospect Street Apartment 4B Burlington Ontario L7N 2P5 / CA | |||
04 /
Cornu, Etienne 40 Wentworth Avenue Cambridge Ontario N1S 1G6 / CA | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020109.4 | 15.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | CA20042481631 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: CA 2481631 | US20050174366 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: US 174366 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638010 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1638010 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638010 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/10, G08B25/08, G10L21/02 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
A61B7/04 (EP,US);
G10L25/00 (EP,US);
H03H2021/0041 (EP,US);
H03H21/0012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | G06F17/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, LI [2007/27] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung eines physiologischen Signals | [2006/12] | English: | Method and system for physiological signal processing | [2006/12] | French: | Procédé et système de traitement d'un signal physiologique | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002301066 ; | [DY]US5492129 (GREENBERGER HAL [US]) [DY] 1-21 * column A; figures 1b,3b,5b,11 *; | [A]US2003063759 (BRENNAN ROBERT L [CA], et al) [A] 15 * column A *; | [Y]US2004071284 (ABUTALEBI HAMID REZA [IR], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column W *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002301066 A 20021015 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,16,20 * abstract * | [PX] - JOHNSON J ET AL, "An Ultra-Low Power Subband-Based Electronic Stethoscope", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2006. ICASSP 2006 PROCEEDINGS. 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOULOUSE, FRANCE 14-19 MAY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060514), ISBN 1-4244-0469-X, pages III - 1156, XP010930773 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2006.1660864 |