EP1640746 - Obstacle detection method and system, particularly for systems for assisting the parking of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta System S.p.A. Via Majakovskij, 10/BCDE 42124 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2010/48] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Meta System S.p.A. via Majakovskij, 10/BCDE 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonazzi, Giuseppe Via Boccaccio, 2/1 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Giardini 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2010/33] | Brunacci, Marco, et al c/o APTA S.r.l. Via Giardini 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2006/24] | Brogi, Graziano APTA S.r.l. Via Giardini 645/1 41100 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2006/13] | Alagem Modiano, Lara S., et al Modiano Gardi Patents Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05020426.2 | 20.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | IT2004MO00245 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: IT MO20040245 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1640746 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1640746 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640746 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/93 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
G01S2015/932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Detektion von Hindernissen, besonders für Einparkhilfe für Fahrzeuge | [2006/13] | English: | Obstacle detection method and system, particularly for systems for assisting the parking of vehicles | [2006/13] | French: | Procédé et système de détection d'obstacle, en particulier pour des systèmes pour aider le stationnement des véhicules | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3540704 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,11-13 * abstract ** column 4, line 8 *; | [XY]DE19845568 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 * * column 6, line 52 * * column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 38 * * column 4, line 55 * * column 1, line 36 * * column 5, line 30 * [Y] 3,11-13 |