EP1642771 - Mirror support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 55-57 90765 Fürth / DE | [2010/03] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG Schuckertstrasse 8-20 90765 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Heinrich Seenheimer Strasse 41 91465 Ergersheim / DE | 02 /
Meier, Markus Ulsenheim 13 91478 Markt Nordheim / DE | 03 /
Reimchen, Richard Oberhäuser Strasse 90 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020460.1 | 20.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20041045973 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045973 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1642771 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1642771 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642771 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
B60R1/0605 (EP,KR,US);
B60J5/0404 (KR);
G02B7/182 (KR);
B60R2011/004 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Spiegelträgerplatte | [2006/14] | English: | Mirror support | [2006/14] | French: | Support de miroir | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2005 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2549555 (PORSCHE AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0609508 (MEKRA RANGAU PLASTICS [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - column 7, line 30 *; | [DA]EP0799744 (MEKRA LANG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP1188616 (MEKRA LANG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0609508 | EP0799744 |