EP1657124 - Airbag system and interior panel for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Shinji c/o Takata Corporation 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2009/48] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
Hayashi, Shinji Takata Corporation 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020485.8 | 20.09.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | JP20040329453 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004329453 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657124 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657124 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657124 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20, B32B27/20 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B60R21/205 (EP,US);
B60R21/2165 (EP,US);
B32B2250/242 (EP,US);
B32B2264/10 (EP,US);
B32B2307/582 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/46] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Airbaganordnung und Innenverkleidung dafür | [2006/20] | English: | Airbag system and interior panel for the same | [2006/20] | French: | Système d'airbag et panneau intérieur de celui-ci | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.12.2009 | [2010/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0275102 (CONTINENTAL CAN CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 46 *; | [Y]JP2001080442 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1097805 (OJI YUKA SYNT PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0017]; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1193140 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0030] , [0035] - [0047]; figures 1-7; claims 1-6; table 1 *; | [A]EP1369220 (YUPO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3* abstract * | by applicant | JP2003137054 |