EP1707316 - GRINDSTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/40] | Abrasive grain and grindstone | ||
[2016/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Hiroshi c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kasuga, Tomoyuki c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Soma, Shinji c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
Morita, Hiroshi c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kasuga, Tomoyuki c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Soma, Shinji c/o Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2006/40] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020615.0 | 21.09.2005 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050090303 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005090303 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1707316 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1707316 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707316 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24D5/02, B24D3/00, B24B53/00, B24D18/00 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
B24D18/00 (EP);
B23K26/40 (EP);
B24B53/00 (EP);
B24D3/00 (EP);
B24D5/02 (EP);
B23K2103/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | B24D5/02, B24D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2016/52] |
Former [2010/12] | DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHLEIFSCHEIBE | [2016/33] | English: | GRINDSTONE | [2016/33] | French: | MEULE | [2016/33] |
Former [2006/40] | Schleifkorn und Schleifscheibe | ||
Former [2006/40] | Abrasive grain and grindstone | ||
Former [2006/40] | Grain abrasif et meule | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 16.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000288942 (NORITAKE DIAMOND IND, et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO0115819 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]US2004142644 (GUNJIMA MUNEHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000288942 |