EP1705771 - Device for cable feedthrough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murrplastik Systemtechnik GmbH Fabrikstrasse 10 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Reule, Hanspeter, et al Wolf Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Reule, Hanspeter, et al Patentanwälte, Wolf & Lutz, Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020647.3 | 22.09.2005 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | DE20051014390 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005014390 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705771 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705771 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/04, H02G3/06, H02G3/22 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H02G15/04 (EP);
H02G3/0675 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | H02G15/04, H02G3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer Leitung | [2006/39] | English: | Device for cable feedthrough | [2006/39] | French: | Dispositif de traversée de câble | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3548079 (JONES PAUL, et al) [X] 10 * abstract *; | [AX]US4234218 (ROGERS ALBERT G) [A] 1,3-5,9 * column 4, line 9 - line 61; figures 1,2 * [X] 10,11,15,16; | [X]GB2171855 (EGERTON A C LTD) [X] 10,11,15,16 * page 1, line 112 - line 125; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4128632 (U.I. LAPP GMBH & CO KG, 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]US6009610 (BRANDOLF HENRY E [US]) [X] 10,11,15 * column 3, line 3 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1220407 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4,17,18 * column 6, line 41 - column 9, line 53; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US5866853 | by applicant | US3548079 | US4234218 | GB2171855 | US4652018 | US6009610 |