EP1643236 - Optical image measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Kinpui 27-12 Shironishi-machi 5-chome Yamagata-shi Yamagata 990-0832 / JP | 02 /
Akiba, Masahiro 2666-2 Nagasaki Nakayama-machi Higashimurayama-gun Yamagata 990-0401 / JP | [2013/49] |
Former [2006/14] | 01 /
Chan, Kinpui 27-12 Shironishi-machi 5-chome Yamagata-shi Yamagata 990-0832 / JP | ||
02 /
Akiba, Masahiro 2666-2 Nagasaki Nakayama-machi Higashimurayama-gun Yamagata 990-0401 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020937.8 | 26.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | JP20040291243 | 04.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004291243 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643236 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643236 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643236 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, G01N21/31, G01N21/47, G01B9/02, A61B5/00, A61B5/1455 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
G01B9/02002 (EP,US);
G01B9/02007 (EP,US);
G01B9/02012 (EP,US);
G01B9/02069 (EP,US);
G01B9/02081 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01N21/21 (EP,US);
G01N21/3151 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
G01B2290/45 (EP,US);
G01B2290/70 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1772 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1787 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0691 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | G01N21/21, G01N21/47, G01N21/31, A61B5/00, G01B9/02 | ||
Former IPC [2006/14] | G01N21/21, G01N21/45, G01N21/49, G01N21/31, G01N33/48, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Optische Bildmessvorrichtung | [2006/14] | English: | Optical image measuring apparatus | [2006/14] | French: | Appareil de mesure d'image optique | [2013/33] |
Former [2006/14] | Appareil de mesure d image optique | Examination procedure | 09.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2005 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.09.2005 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5459570 (SWANSON ERIC A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6014216 (ZORABEDIAN PAUL [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US6015969 (NATHEL HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [DA]JP2001330558 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - AKIBA M ET AL, "Full-field optical coherence tomography by two-dimensional heterodyne detection with a pair of CCD cameras", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20030515), vol. 28, no. 10, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 816 - 818, XP002340831 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.28.000816 | [A] - AKIBA M ET AL, "Video-rate optical coherence imaging by two-dimensional heterodyne detection", CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS. (CLEO 2001). TECHNICAL DIGEST. POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. BALTIMORE, MD, MAY 6-11, 2001, TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS. (TOPS), US, WASHINGTON, WA : OSA, US, (20010506), VOL. 56, ISBN 1-55752-662-1, pages 380 - 380, XP010559967 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLEO.2001.947944 |