EP1643121 - Independent timing retard for engine speed limiting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walbro Engine Management, L.L.C. 7400 North Oracle Road Suite 310 Tucson Arizona 85704 / US | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Martin N. 1660 Colwood Road Caro, MI 48723 / US | 02 /
Pattullo, George M. 2330 Jacob Road Caro, MI 48723 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Wehnert, Werner, et al Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021138.2 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | US20040955707 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 955707 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643121 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643121 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02P9/00, F02P1/08 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
F02P9/005 (EP,US);
F02D2400/06 (EP,US);
F02P1/086 (EP,US);
F02P11/025 (EP,US);
F02P3/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2008/03] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Unabhängige Zündwinkellageverzögerung für die Motordrehzahlbegrenzung | [2006/14] | English: | Independent timing retard for engine speed limiting | [2006/14] | French: | Retard d'allumage indépendant pour limiter le régime d'un moteur | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4010726 (KONDO TETSUYA, et al) [X] 1-8,11 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4038951 (SCHWEIKART HORST) [X] 1-8 * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 16; figures 7,8,10 *; | [A]US4344395 (KONDO TADASHIGE, et al) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5117792 (KANNO ISAO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 20 - line 39; figure 2 *; | [X]WO03087568 (IIDA DENKI KOGYO KK [JP], et al)[X] 1-9,11; | [PX]EP1496249 (IIDA DENKI KOGYO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0018] , [0056] , [0059]; figures 11,12 * |