EP1662197 - Metal reflector and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auer Lighting GmbH Hildesheimer Strasse 35 37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | [2008/10] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehrtens, Andree, Dr. Am Schneppel 18 31073 Grünenplan / DE | 02 /
Küpper, Thomas Neue Strasse 4 37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | 03 /
Zogg, Lutz Fasanenweg 22 37581 Gandersheim / DE | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021364.4 | 30.09.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | DE20041049134 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049134 | DE20051028456 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028456 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1662197 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1662197 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662197 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, C23C14/00, G02B5/00, C23C28/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
G02B5/0858 (EP,US);
F21V7/06 (KR);
F21S41/37 (EP,US);
F21V29/505 (EP,US);
F21V7/00 (KR);
F21V7/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | Metallreflektor und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2006/22] | English: | Metal reflector and method of producing the same | [2006/22] | French: | Réflecteur en métal et méthode de production | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 29.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | EE | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | IE | 21.04.2010 | IT | 21.04.2010 | LT | 21.04.2010 | LV | 21.04.2010 | NL | 21.04.2010 | PL | 21.04.2010 | RO | 21.04.2010 | SE | 21.04.2010 | SI | 21.04.2010 | SK | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | BG | 21.07.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | ES | 01.08.2010 | IS | 21.08.2010 | PT | 23.08.2010 | AT | 30.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | GB | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | LU | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 22.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
TR | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 30.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
LU | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 30.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
LU | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 30.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 30.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 30.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 21.04.2010 | |
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 21.04.2010 | |
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 21.04.2010 | |
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 21.04.2010 | |
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 21.04.2010 | |
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 21.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20030018521 ; | [Y]DE2352747 (INFRAROEDTEKNIK AB) [Y] 18-20 * page 6 - page 7; figures 2-4 *; | [DX]US3944320 (MCLINTIC WILLIAM JAMES) [DX] 1,2,4,5,9-12,16,23,24,26-28,35-38,40-51 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 41 *; | [A]DE2925380 (BFG GLASSGROUP) [A] 39 * page 5 *; | [A]DE8310962U (AGFA-GEVAERT AG, 5090 LEVERKUSEN, DE) [A] 47,48* page 3, line 14 - line 18 *; | [X]DE8906325U (KITAZAWA MULTICOAT CO., LTD., KANAGAWA, JP) [X] 16,23-29,35,37,38,40,43-52 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 17; figure 2 *; | [X]US5142387 (SHIKAMA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * column 4, line 62 - line 64 *; | [X]EP0649042 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 53 - line 57 *; | [XY]US6561675 (KAVANAGH MARTIN [GB]) [X] 1-9,11,16,17,23,27,28,30-39,46-48,57,58,61,62,67-71 * Spalte 12, Zeile19 - Zeile 23 *; column 6, line 9 - column 8, line 61; figures 4,8,9 * * column 6, line 9 - column 8, line 61 * [Y] 10,12-15,18-20,48-53,59,60,63,64; | [Y]DE10227621 (LICHT & DESIGN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 60,63,64 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] *; | [Y]WO2004026785 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [Y] 10,12-15,48-53,59 * Seite 12, Zeile 25 - Zeile 30; page 19, line 7 - line 12; tables 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 46, Database accession no. 2003-490266, XP002365224 & KR20030018521 A 20030306 (LEE E S) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * | Examination | EP1734301 | by applicant | DE10029905 |