EP1642537 - Multi-lumen aortic cannula [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH Lindberghstrasse 25 80939 München / DE | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Andreas, Dr. Kapellenweg 11 82335 Berg / DE | 02 /
Göllner, Marcus Winzererstr. 174 80797 München / DE | 03 /
Wetzig, Michael Trappentreustrasse 25 80339 München / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021440.2 | 30.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20041047970 | 01.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004047970 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642537 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642537 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61M25/10, A61M1/36 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A61M1/3653 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP);
A61M1/3659 (EP,US);
A61M25/003 (EP);
A61B2017/00243 (EP);
A61M2210/127 (EP);
A61M25/0032 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrlumige Aortenkanüle | [2006/14] | English: | Multi-lumen aortic cannula | [2006/14] | French: | Canule aortique à plusieurs lumens | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 06.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5425708 (NASU NORIO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 32 - line 68 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 29; figure 2 * [Y] 4,9; | [DXY]US5868703 (BERTOLERO ARTHUR A [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,8 * column 8, line 55 - column 10, line 30; figures 4,7,12 * * column 13, line 42 - column 14, line 3 * [Y] 4,9; | [Y]US6228053 (MORSE STEPHEN A [US]) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 24 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]US2001023357 (MAAHS TRACY D [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002111583 (WRIGHT JOHN T M [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002151869 (KOMTEBEDDE JAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0021]; figure 7 *; | [Y]US2003167038 (YOZU RYOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0073] , [0074]; figures 6-8 * |