EP1611860 - Intraosseous nerve denervation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relievant Medsystems, Inc. 721 Sandoval Way Hayward CA 94544 / US | [2011/03] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states DePuy Spine, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellegrino, Richard C. 33 Northbridge Road Mendon MA 01756 / US | 02 /
Papineau, Paula 10 Stoney Road West Bridgewater MA 02379 / US | 03 /
Crombie, John S. 29 Walmut Terrace East Hannover NJ 07936 / US | 04 /
Patel, Samit 488 Rt. 38 East Maple Shade NJ 08052 / US | 05 /
Ryan, Thomas P. 16 Fieldstone Place Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [2006/05] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
Pellegrino, Richard C. 33 Northbridge Road Mendon MA 01756 / US | ||
02 /
Papineau, Paula 10 Stoney Road West Bridgewater MA 02379 / US | |||
03 /
Crombie, John S. 29 Walmut Terrace East Hannover NJ 07936 / US | |||
04 /
Patel, Samit 488 Rt. 38 East Maple Shade NJ 08052 / US | |||
05 /
Ryan, Thomas P. 16 Fieldstone Place Flemingtone NJ 08822 / US | Representative(s) | Lusinchi, Laurent Pierre, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Lusinchi, Laurent Pierre, et al Ladas & Parry LLP, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/17] | Orr, Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05021597.9 | 30.09.2003 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20020260879 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 260879 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611860 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1611860 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611860 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00434 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Denervierung des Intraossalnervs | [2006/01] | English: | Intraosseous nerve denervation device | [2006/01] | French: | Outil pour la dénervation du nerf intraossal | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03256168.0 / EP1402838 | Divisional application(s) | EP10012523.6 / EP2286753 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030256168) is 24.01.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | LU | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4323585 (DELMA ELEKTRO MED APP [DE]) [X] 8 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5433739 (SLUIJTER MENNO E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 26 ** column 9, line 15 - line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9636289 (SYMBIOSIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 7, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP1013228 (AZWELL INC [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6423059 (HANSON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 8 * column 4, line 41 - line 56 * | Examination | US6287304 | by applicant | US5697909 | US6139545 | EP1059067 | WO0157655 | US6312426 |