EP1657436 - Vehicle control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taki, Nobuyuki, @Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
Taki, Nobuyuki, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/16] |
Former [2006/20] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021647.2 | 04.10.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | JP20040326865 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004326865 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657436 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657436 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657436 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02D41/02, F02D41/06, B60W10/06, B60W30/18, F02D41/24 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B60W50/0098 (EP);
B60W30/18018 (EP);
B60W30/192 (EP);
F02D41/065 (EP);
F02N11/0822 (EP);
F02D2200/502 (EP);
F02N2200/0801 (EP);
F02N2200/0802 (EP);
F02N2200/102 (EP);
F02N2200/103 (EP);
F02N2200/105 (EP);
F02N2200/124 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | F02N11/08, F02D41/02, F02D41/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/16] |
Former [2010/43] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungsvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/20] | English: | Vehicle control device | [2006/20] | French: | Appareil de commande pour véhicule | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 29.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.04.2017 | GB | 04.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/15] | IT | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4510396 (UCHIDA SHIGEKATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-7 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 15 *; | [X]DE10211461 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,4* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016]; figures 4,5 *; | [XP]EP1541864 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [XP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0015]; figure 3 *; | [XP]US2005143901 (SCHOLT TORSTEN [DE], et al) [XP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 29]; figure 3 * | by applicant | JP2004169588 | JP2004326865 |