EP1657455 - Clutch linkage with vibration isolation and damping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Truck Intellectual Property Company, LLC 4201 Winfield Road Warrenville, Illinois 60555 / US | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woehrle, Harry G. 1001 Bayhill Avenue Naperville, IL 60565 / US | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021731.4 | 05.10.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | US20040985465 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: US 985465 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657455 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657455 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657455 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C7/04, F16D23/12, F16F15/08 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F16F7/108 (EP,US);
F16C7/04 (EP,US);
F16D23/12 (EP,US);
F16C2361/43 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20006 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2144 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2146 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | F16C7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/48] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kuplungsgestänge mit Schwingungsisolation und -dämpfung | [2006/20] | English: | Clutch linkage with vibration isolation and damping | [2006/20] | French: | Tringlerie d'embrayage avec isolation et amortissement de vibrations | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09006082.3 / EP2078871 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.10.2009 | [2011/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US172903 (ROBERT ADAMS) [X] 1,12-17 * figure 2 * * page 1 * [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [X]US1703592 (PATON CLYDE R) [X] 1,12-17 * figure 4 * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 14 *; | [XY]US4641810 (OTT VERNON D [US]) [X] 1,12-17 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 13 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [A]US2001015306 (RISCH DAVID [CN], et al) [A] 1,4,7-9,12,13,15* the whole document *; | [XA]WO0242660 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP], et al) [X] 12,13 * abstract * [A] 1,4,8,9,15,16; | [Y]US2004016618 (BENDER BURNELL L [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4641810 |