EP1645431 - Method for manufacture of lithographic printing plate precursor for dry lithographic printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonokawa, Koji Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021911.2 | 07.10.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | JP20040295297 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004295297 | JP20040295298 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004295298 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1645431 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1645431 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645431 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41N1/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
B41N1/003 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckplatten für den wasserlosen Flachdruck | [2006/15] | English: | Method for manufacture of lithographic printing plate precursor for dry lithographic printing | [2006/15] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression lithographiques pour l'impression lithographique à sec | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07004027.4 / EP1816005 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | BE | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | CZ | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | IT | 11.06.2008 | LT | 11.06.2008 | LV | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | PL | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | IE | 07.10.2008 | LU | 07.10.2008 | IS | 11.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IE | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 07.10.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IE | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 07.10.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IE | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 07.10.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IE | 07.10.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IE | 07.10.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JPH11245529 ; | [AD]JP2002240452 ; | [XA]EP1029666 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 6-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0032] , [0035] - [0041] - [0052] , [0054] , [0059] * [A] 1-5; | [A]EP1112843 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0051] , [0058] , [0073] - [0093] *; | [A]EP1201425 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0048] , [0054] - [0058] - [0079] - [0096] * | [XDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11245529 A 19990914 (TORAY IND INC) [XD] 6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] , [0027] , [0109] - [0116] - [0128] * [A] 1-5 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002240452 A 20020828 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [AD] 4,7,10 * abstract * |