EP1775677 - System and method for delivering products, component and delivery point for products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Post AG Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 20 53113 Bonn / DE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulrich, Keith Kinkelstrasse 14 53227 Bonn-Oberkassel / DE | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Ulrich, Keith Lahnweg 40 53129 Bonn / DE | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021967.4 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775677 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Warenauslieferungssystem, Verfahren zur Auslieferung von Waren, Versandkomponente und Ausgabestelle für Waren | [2007/16] | English: | System and method for delivering products, component and delivery point for products | [2007/16] | French: | Système et procédé de livraison des produits, élément d'expédition et comptoir de sortie pour des produits | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 26.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/37] | 24.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP11159753.0 / EP2369542 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5963134 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, line 65 - column 5, line 45 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 14 * * figures 5-10 *; | [A]US6260029 (CRITELLI MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [A]US2002113123 (OTTO JEROME A [US], et al) [A] * column W *; | [A]EP1244043 (ACCENTURE LLP [US]) [A] * column W *; | [A]US2002170961 (DICKSON BRUCE [US], et al) [A] * column W *; | [A]WO03098533 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 34 *; | [A]US2004143558 (SANSONE RONALD P [US]) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | US2004143558 [ ] (SANSONE RONALD P [US]); | [Y]WO2004109606 (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 5 - page 10, line 10 *; | [A]WO2005059790 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 25 * * page 7, line 17 - page 10, line 18 * | by applicant | DE20207972U | EP0927945 | WO03098533 | EP1279132 | EP1409160 | DE10324538 | EP1421537 | EP1408801 | EP1408802 |