EP1650071 - Drive arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77813 Bühl / DE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Wolfgang Hardkopfweg 7 77815 Bühl / DE | 02 /
Friedmann, Oswald Mooser Strasse 59 77839 Lichtenau / DE | 03 /
Mair, Ulrich Paulinenstrasse 66 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
Reik, Wolfgang, Dr. Sonnhalde 8 77815 Bühl / DE | 05 /
Scheufler, Christian, Dr. Vimbucher Strasse 27 77815 Bühl / DE | [2006/17] | Application number, filing date | 05022102.7 | 11.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | DE20041051473 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051473 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650071 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650071 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650071 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H29/04, H02K7/18, B60K17/04 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H02K7/006 (EP);
B60K17/04 (EP);
B60K17/34 (EP);
B60L15/20 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
F16H29/04 (EP);
B60L2220/50 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP);
B60L2240/441 (EP);
B60L2240/486 (EP);
B60L2240/507 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | B60K6/04, F16H29/04, H02K7/18, B60K17/04 | ||
Former IPC [2006/17] | B60K6/04, F16H29/04, H02K7/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung | [2006/17] | English: | Drive arrangement | [2006/17] | French: | Agencement d'actionnement | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IE | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | LV | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | AT | 11.10.2009 | GB | 11.10.2009 | LU | 11.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
AT | 11.10.2009 | ||
GB | 11.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
AT | 11.10.2009 | ||
GB | 11.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
AT | 11.10.2009 | ||
GB | 11.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
AT | 11.10.2009 | ||
GB | 11.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
GB | 11.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB132628 (DUNN, WILLIAM) [X] 62 * page 4, line 50 - page 5, line 7; figures 5,17-19 * [A] 1,16; | [A]JPH08175476 ; | [A]US3799284 (HENDER B) [A] 16* abstract *; | [A]DE2342019 (SANDER THEODOR) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0392807 (WEN MAZ [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0058121 (SILER S R L [IT], et al) [Y] 1-4,10,14,15,30-32,37-50,57-61 * abstract *; | [A]US6537168 (HAN KYUNG SOO [US]) [A] 16 * column 5, line 45 - line 51; figure 15 *; | [DYAX]DE10243533 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [DY] 1-4,10,14,15,30-32,37-50,57-61 * paragraphs [0048] , [0119] , [0120] , [0122] , [0123] * * figures 1,2,5-8 * [A] 16 [X] 62; | [XA] - "VARIABLE-ECCENTRIC CVT", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEER, PROFESSIONAL ENGINEERING PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (19930401), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0307-6490, page 57, XP000364735 [X] 62 * the whole document * [A] 1,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08175476 A 19960709 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |