EP1647894 - Information processing apparatus with parallel DMA processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anjo, Kenichiro c/o NEC Electronics Corp 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 02 /
Togawa, Katsumi c/o NEC Electronics Corp 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Ryoko c/o NEC Electronics Corp 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022144.9 | 11.10.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | JP20040297639 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004297639 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1647894 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1647894 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/31] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsgerät mit parallelen DMA-Prozessen | [2006/16] | English: | Information processing apparatus with parallel DMA processes | [2006/16] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'information avec processus DMA parallèles | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 23.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5961640 (CHAMBERS PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,14,23 * abstract * * column 2, line 66 - column 15, line 14 * * figures 1a-7d *; | [X]WO9959078 (PORT CORP C [US], et al) [X] 1,14,23 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 74, line 23 * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]US2003221086 (SIMOVICH SLOBODAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 1-6 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2004184457 (GREGORIO LORENZO DI [DE], et al) [X] 1,14,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0087] ** figures 1-9 * |